open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:19-00286
    Party Name:Laura Katherine Steel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Undeliverable Mail]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [To Omitted Creditors]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?32257
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =