open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00029
    Party Name:Nicori v. Dolstram
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation - (NO Final R&R to Issue)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?62593
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =