open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00132-1
    Party Name:USA v. Bickell
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation re Incorrect PDF Associated]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict ]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions ]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List ]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List Public Doc]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Voir Dire Begun ]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine ]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation re Combined Documents]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference ]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objections to Exhibits]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Brief ]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [DEPS Notice]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unopposed Motion]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Arrest]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63008
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =