open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00007
    Party Name:Fitzsimons v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation re Opening Brief]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt For Funds]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63075
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =