open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00306
    Party Name:Brendtro v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation re Opening Brief]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63088
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =