open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00308
    Party Name:Sauder v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Related Document]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation re Opening Brief]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63105
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =