open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00039
    Party Name:Francis v. Celis et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returned/Undeliverable Mail]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63108
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =