open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00309
    Party Name:Bassett v. Aetna, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Status Report Order]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service List]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63118
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =