open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00310
    Party Name:Tomelleri v. Kendall Brough
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Status Report Order]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63119
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =