open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:20-00050
    Party Name:Victor Joseph Proton
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.akb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?32424
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =