U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Violation Disposition Report]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Petition for Warrant for Person Under Supervision - 12C]
  • July 12, 2022: [Subsequent Petition for Person Under Supervision - 12C]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 07, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned - MJ Retired]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [USPO Request for Modification - 12B]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • January 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • January 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 05, 2021: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • October 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 23, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 23, 2020: [PSIReferred]
  • October 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • October 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order of Release]
  • June 24, 2020: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2020: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • June 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
  • February 24, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 24, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 24, 2020: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
  • February 24, 2020: [Indictment - For Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.