U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00016-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Millhouse et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Arrest]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order of Release]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2021: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • May 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 21, 2021: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • May 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C]
  • May 06, 2021: [Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • March 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • March 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • February 04, 2021: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • January 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • December 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2020: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • December 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • October 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 26, 2020: [PSIReferred]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • October 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: [PSIReferred]
  • October 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • October 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • October 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • June 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Arrest]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA]
  • June 10, 2020: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA]
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order of Release]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 15, 2020: [Document - Sealed pdf]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2020: [Third Party Custodian Report]
  • April 07, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 11, 2020: [Protective Order ]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 06, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 05, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 05, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Setting Trial By Jury]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 25, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.