U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tuzroyluk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • April 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • March 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • March 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 04, 2021: [Additional Related Document]
  • March 03, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • January 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2020: [Docket Annotation re no Proposed Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • October 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2020: [PSIReferred]
  • October 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • October 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • October 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 12, 2020: [Status Report]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order of Release]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 11, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2020: [Appear]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.