open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:20-00086
    Party Name:Alaska Urological Institute, P.C.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Corporation / Partnership) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Authority to Obtain Credit (Under Sec 364) (CM23)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Add Party]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral (CM04)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Pay]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ (CM41)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.akb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?32460
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =