open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00188
    Party Name:Specialized Transport & Rigging, LLC. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittburgh, PA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64914
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =