open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00190
    Party Name:Meglitsch v. Southcentral Foundation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service List]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Status Report Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64927
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =