open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00191
    Party Name:Blaylock v. Houser
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation re Non-payment of Habeas]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64928
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =