open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00008
    Party Name:Metlakatla Indian Community v. Dunleavy et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64943
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =