open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:20-00222
    Party Name:Beatriz Labnao Bolger
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
    Date Published:September 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
    Date Published:September 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:September 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.akb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?32604
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =