U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00299
  • Case Name: Baxter v. Municipality of Anchorage
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice Re: Chamber Copy]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Witness List]
  • December 17, 2021: [Witness List]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 09, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • March 09, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Status Report]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Unissued Summons]
  • December 28, 2020: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order re Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 30, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.