U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lively et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [1 - Set/Reset Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 10, 2022: [PSIReferred]
  • May 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 07, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • May 06, 2022: [Information - Felony]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2022: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [1 - Set/Reset Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 19, 2022: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • January 13, 2022: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2021: [PSIReferred]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request for Modification]
  • September 10, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Status Report]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 30, 2021: [Trial Scheduling Conference]
  • June 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order - Sealed pdf]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order of Release]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Arrest]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - For Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.