U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Serradell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2022: [PSIReferred]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Trial Scheduling Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 28, 2021: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • May 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
  • May 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment - For Public]
  • May 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.