U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00109
  • Case Name: James Steven Silvernail, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Services Rendered Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e)]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • September 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Matrix]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Entry of Discharge]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)]
  • September 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
July, 2021
  • July 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Terminate Deadline]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.