U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sharp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 07, 2022: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [PSIReferred]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Trial Scheduling Conference]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2021: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • July 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment - For Public]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.