U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Michael et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Trial Scheduling Conference]
  • December 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order of Release]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2022: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Arrest]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request for Modification]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [PSIReferred]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 15, 2022: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2022: [PSIReferred]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • December 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2021: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • November 20, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • November 15, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Trial Scheduling Conference]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order of Release]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • September 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • September 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Arrest]
  • September 02, 2021: [Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order of Release]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 20, 2021: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment - For Public]
  • July 23, 2021: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.