U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00137
  • Case Name: Dominic Stefano Imperato and Andrea Kate Imperato
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Services Rendered Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e)]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Debtor Information]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event)]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.