U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00138
  • Case Name: William Lawrence Regallo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 14, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) ]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Proceeding Memo]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Non-Opposition]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time (SA)]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time]
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • March 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ (CM41)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time]
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Non-Opposition]
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Deadline (Objections - all types)]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Services Rendered Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e)]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01)]
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Terminate Deadline]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • October 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Extend Time]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
July, 2021
  • July 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • July 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • July 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.