U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00140
  • Case Name: Loretta Zabala Caparas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Services Rendered Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e)]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • August 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • August 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • August 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2021
  • July 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.