U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00171
  • Case Name: Anthony Robinson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • April 13, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • April 13, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • April 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • January 31, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • January 31, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Claims (SA)]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Affidavit of Service]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • October 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.