U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00172
  • Case Name: Gretchen Marie Augat
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Declination]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Services Rendered Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e)]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event)]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Declaration]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.