U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00173
  • Case Name: Rodney E Montoya and Rosalinda D Montoya
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
December, 2021
  • December 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Homestead Exemption (CM46-COAwith)]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Sell Property (Under Sec 363(b))]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Forbearance (CARES ACT)]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Sell Property (Sec 363(b) - NOT Free & Clear) (CM22)]
  • October 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • October 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Terminate Deadline]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • October 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.