U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00181
  • Case Name: Christopher John Olson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Trustee Services Rendered Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e)]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)]
  • January 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01)]
  • January 13, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event)]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.