U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00182
  • Case Name: Louis Robert McCue
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Trustee Services Rendered Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e)]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
December, 2021
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Update Debtor Information]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Change of Address]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.