U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00183
  • Case Name: Reuben James Johnston
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.