U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00184
  • Case Name: Jayson Harold Franklin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
December, 2021
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.