U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00191
  • Case Name: Karen Louise Drury
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Matrix]
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Change of Address]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustee Services Rendered Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e)]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • November 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.