U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00190
  • Case Name: Lane Herman Drury
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Trustees Final Report (TFR)]
  • October 19, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Special Notice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Errata]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ (CM41)]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Report of Sale]
July, 2022
  • July 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01)]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Order (SA)]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Generic Motion / Application]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Sell Property (Under Sec 363(b))]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Terminate Deadline]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • May 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Request for Special Notice]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Sell Property (Sec 363(b) - NOT Free & Clear) (CM22)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • April 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Avoid Lien]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • April 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ]
  • April 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration]
  • April 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Employ (CM41)]
  • April 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Setting Hearing (SA)]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • February 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • February 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Proceeding Memo]
  • February 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail)]
  • February 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Order (Generic) (SA)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • January 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Setting Hearing (SA)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Avoid Lien (CM07)]
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Matrix]
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Change of Address]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • November 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.