U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-90011
  • Case Name: Jipping(7) v. Saeteune
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 06, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Default Judgment (SA)]
  • February 02, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Entry of Default]
  • January 26, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration]
  • January 26, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Entry of Default]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 23, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 15, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Adversary Review Completed]
  • November 15, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 15, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.