U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00192
  • Case Name: Raintree Properties and Leasing, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Close BK Case Utility (See Final Decree for Regular BK Closings)]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • January 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Debtor]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Case Status Report]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Matrix]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Debtor]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Terminate Deadline]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H (Form 106H & 206H)]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G (Form 106G & 206G)]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F (Form 106E/F & 206E/F)]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D (Form 106D & 206D)]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B (Form 106A/B & 206A/B)]
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Corporation / Partnership) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ (CM41)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (Form 104 & 204)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.