U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00193
  • Case Name: Grigoriy Konstantinovich Berkuta
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Report of Sale]
July, 2022
  • July 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Sell Property (Under Sec 363(b))]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Objections - all types)]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Sell Property (Sec 363(b) - NOT Free & Clear) (CM22)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • April 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Extend Time (SA)]
  • April 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement of Declination]
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim]
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Employ]
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Declaration]
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Employ (CM41)]
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)]
  • March 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01)]
  • March 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • March 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Clerks Notice of Presumed Abuse]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Presumed Abuse (BNC Notice)]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Converting Case to Chapter 7 (BKCONV01-COAfter) (SA)]
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Converting Case to Chapter 7 (BKCONV01-COAfter) (SA)]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Conversion From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee)]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Attorney]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Excepted from Electronic Filing]
  • January 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • November 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.