U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00194
  • Case Name: Larry Gaddis Earnest
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2022
  • February 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • February 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismissing Case (SA)]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)]
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.