U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Tikigaq Construction, LLC v. Janus Global Operations LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 12, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • December 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
  • May 25, 2022: [Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order re Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2022: [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney]
  • May 13, 2022: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • May 13, 2022: [Unissued Summons]
  • May 13, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.