U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00054
  • Case Name: The United States of America v. The State of Alaska et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [USCA Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [USCA Order]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • July 27, 2022: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • July 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • July 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 01, 2022: [Intervene]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 22, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 14, 2022: [Joinder to Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice Re: Chamber Copy]
  • June 10, 2022: [Intervene]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 03, 2022: [Joinder to Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Docket Annotation re Motion to Intervene]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Intervene]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 24, 2022: [Expedite]
  • May 24, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2022: [Unissued Summons]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 17, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.