U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Estate of Jayson Vinberg v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Witness List]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 18, 2022: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 05, 2022: [Affidavit]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order re Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 16, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 14, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 03, 2022: [1 - Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 03, 2022: [Unissued Summons]
  • June 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 27, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • May 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.