U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00139
  • Case Name: Whittier Seafood, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ (CM41)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline / Hearing (Plan or Disclosure Statement)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Confirmation Hrg (SA)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Supplement To Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Supplement to Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • February 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • February 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • January 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • January 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • December 30, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Disclosure Statement]
  • December 30, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • December 20, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 06, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • December 05, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulated Order (SA)]
  • December 04, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • October 18, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • October 18, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Debtor]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 (Fee) (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM11)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Terminate Deadline]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Objections - all types)]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Matrix]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ Nunc Pro Tunc (CM41)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.