U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00148
  • Case Name: Aleksey N Kozlov
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Case Status Report]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Addendum]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit To]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend / Limit Exclusivity Period (CM16)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Periodic Report (Form 426)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Under Advisement Deadline & Flag]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Served Conventionally By Mail or By Email]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Terminate Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Objections - all types)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Original Signature for Previous Filing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice Requiring Original Signature]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ (CM41)]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • February 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
  • February 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend / Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • February 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • January 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • January 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • January 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • December 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • November 18, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Discharge / Closing)]
  • November 07, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • November 04, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Examination (Rule 2004)]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • October 23, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Terminate Deadline]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ Nunc Pro Tunc (CM41)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.