U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00080
  • Case Name: Yak Timber Inc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close BK Case Utility (See Final Decree for Regular BK Closings)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree (Order from Judge) (SA)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Administrative Expenses]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Terminate Deadline]
  • February 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice Requiring Original Signature]
  • February 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-PCR)]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • January 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-PCR)]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.