U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00062
  • Case Name: Thomas Kroscavage and Sharolyn Kroscavage
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
November, 2024
  • November 09, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.