U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00126
  • Case Name: Spellman Ray Warner and Shanell Domonique Warner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Claims (SA)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.