U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kitka
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.